VA SB1759 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Undergrounding utility lines pilot program; transportation infrastructure improvement; urban county executive form of government. Establishes a pilot program under which the governing body of any locality operating under the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) may request an electric utility to place underground electric utility distribution lines in transportation projects to serve and facilitate the creation of transit-oriented development in such locality in conjunction with a transportation infrastructure improvement project that the Commonwealth Transportation Board identifies that reduces congestion, improves mobility, incorporates transit systems and improves safety. The measure provides that the locality and the utility shall enter into an agreement that provides that (i) the locality shall pay to the utility its full additional costs of relocating and converting that portion of the line located in the locality underground rather than overhead that are not recoverable under applicable rates, net of relocation credits, which costs shall include associated feasibility costs, or any smaller portion of such costs as the utility and the locality may agree; (ii) the locality shall impose an additional levy on electric utility customers in the locality in an amount sufficient to cover the utility's additional costs, which levy shall not exceed $1 per month on residential customers and shall be collected by the utility on behalf of the locality; (iii) the utility shall convert, operate, and maintain the agreed portion of the line underground; and (iv) other terms and conditions on which the parties may agree shall be included in the agreement. The measure provides that upon presentation of the agreement to the Commonwealth Transportation Board, the Commissioner of Highways shall be responsible for securing the necessary easements and permits for the pilot program. The measure provides that the pilot program terminates on July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Underground electric distribution lines; placing in areas of transit-oriented development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1759ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19107326D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (93-Y 4-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute SB1759H1
2019-02-19HouseSubstitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 19107326D-H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee amendments from Commerce and Labor rejected
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseFloor substitute printed 19107326D-H1 (Kilgore)
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
2019-02-05SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1759S2
2019-02-05SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 19106453D-S2
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19106254D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-05SenateFloor substitute printed 19106453D-S2 (Surovell)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 3-N)
2019-01-31SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106254D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19100654D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332367.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1759
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1759+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1759S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1759S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1759H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1759ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0792+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0087+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0245+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1759+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0439SB1759+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0442SB1759+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0443SB1759+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1759+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0192+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3025+SB1759
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0885SB1759+SB1759

Bill Comments

feedback