VA SB1774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board for Contractors; requirements for licensure; certification of automatic fire sprinkler inspectors. Creates the classification of fire sprinkler contractor for the purpose of licensure by the Board for Contractors (the Board). The bill also creates a certification for automatic fire sprinkler inspectors and prohibits any person from conducting inspections of automatic fire sprinkler systems unless he maintains or is accompanied by a person who maintains a Level II or higher NICET certification. The bill requires the Board to promulgate regulations requiring continuing education and knowledge of the Statewide Fire Prevention Code as prerequisites for certification renewal as an automatic fire sprinkler inspector. The provisions of the bill mandating NICET certification have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic fire sprinkler inspectors; requirement for licensure, certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective - see bill)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1774ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19104697D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1774E
2019-01-31SenateAmendments by Senator Edwards agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
2019-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104697D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5411100(n/a)See Bill Text
5411106(n/a)See Bill Text
5411108(n/a)See Bill Text
5411108.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5411147(n/a)See Bill Text
5411148(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1774
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1774+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1774E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1774ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0726+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0089+SB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1774+SB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0306SB1774+SB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0025+SB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0263+SB1774
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3026+SB1774

Bill Comments

feedback