VA SB1778 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health regulatory boards; conversion therapy. Directs the Board of Counseling, the Board of Medicine, the Board of Nursing, the Board of Psychology, and the Board of Social Work to each promulgate regulations prohibiting the use of electroshock therapy, aversion therapy, or other physical treatments in the practice of conversion therapy with any person under 18 years of age.
Title
Counseling minors; certain health regulatory boards to promulgate regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1778S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106131D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106131D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (7-Y 6-N 2-A) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104585D |