VA SB1781 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contests of certain elections; location of proceeding to contest. Clarifies that a proceeding to contest (i) a primary election for the United States House of Representatives, the Virginia Senate, the House of Delegates, or any county, city, town, or district office or (ii) an election to any county, city, town, or district office shall be in the circuit court of the county or city that the challenged candidate listed as his residency on his certificate of candidate qualification. Currently, the law provides that such proceeding be in the county or city in which the challenged candidate resides.
Title
Contests of certain elections; location of proceeding to contest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1781ER) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104092D |