VA SB1786 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional release of terminally ill prisoners. Makes eligible for consideration by the Parole Board for conditional release any person who is terminally ill and is serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction for a felony offense, other than a Class 1 felony.
Title
Geriatric, terminally ill, or permanently physically disabled prisoners; conditional release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1786S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105842D-S1 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105842D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19105286D |