VA SB1787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; compliance verification. Requires motor vehicle insurance companies to report all required insurance information to the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) within 30 days of a policy change and to respond to all DMV requests for acknowledgment by confirming or denying the existence of an insurance policy within 15 days of receiving the request. The measure requires such insurers to report all necessary insurance information to the DMV electronically. The measure updates the types of policy updates and necessary data fields required to operate DMV's insurance verification process. The measure requires DMV to initiate the insurance verification process following receipt of a report that it processed an uninsured motorist claim involving an uninsured motor vehicle registered in Virginia. The measure provides that if a customer opts to surrender his license plates to DMV online or by telephone, he is not entitled to a partial refund of the cost of registration fees. The measure authorizes the DMV to dispense with a customer's suspension if a customer provides evidence that he was in compliance with Virginia's insurance laws. The measure renames the fee charged after a violation of Virginia's insurance laws from the uninsured motor vehicle fee to the noncompliance fee, increases the fee from $500 to $600, and directs the additional revenue to the DMV's special fund to be used for enhancements to DMV's insurance verification program. The measure also amends Virginia's installment payment program to (i) allow out-of-state individuals to apply for an installment payment plan; (ii) allow a customer to enter into a second installment payment plan after defaulting on the first plan; and (iii) authorize the Commissioner to extend an installment payment due date by up to 30 days when events outside of DMV's control adversely affect its ability to accept payment. An enactment clause requires DMV to report in 2024 to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of this measure in improving the insurance verification program. An enactment clause postpones the effective date of the provisions that require electronic filing of insurance information and update the types of data required to be provided by insurers. This bill is identical to HB 1867.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; compliance verification by DMV.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1787ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104152D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 688 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |