VA SB1788 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

City of Virginia Beach; sports or entertainment project. Grants the City of Virginia Beach certain powers relating to construction of a sports or entertainment project and any related facilities. Among those powers is the authority to (i) issue bonds to construct a sports or entertainment project, (ii) receive state sales and use tax revenue that is attributable to such project, and (iii) use such revenue to repay such bonds. The bill provides that the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue shall expire on July 1, 2039. The powers granted by the bill to the City of Virginia Beach are similar to those granted to the Hampton Roads Sports Facility Authority. City of Virginia Beach; sports or entertainment project. Grants the City of Virginia Beach certain powers relating to construction of a sports or entertainment project and any related facilities. Among those powers is the authority to (i) issue bonds to construct a sports or entertainment project, (ii) receive state sales and use tax revenue that is attributable to such project, and (iii) use such revenue to repay such bonds. The bill provides that the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue shall expire on July 1, 2039. The powers granted by the bill to the City of Virginia Beach are similar to those granted to the Hampton Roads Sports Facility Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports or entertainment project; City of Va. Beach granted certain powers relating to construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenateStricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead first time
2019-02-15SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-13SenatePresented and ordered printed 19107042D
2019-02-13SenateUnanimous consent to introduce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1525928(n/a)See Bill Text
1525934(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback