VA SB1789 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Trooper Lucas B. Dowell Bridge. Designates Designating the Trooper Lucas B. Dowell Bridge. Designates the bridge on Interstate 81 in Smyth County over Whitetop Road the
Title
Designating the Trooper Lucas B. Dowell Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1789ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19106963D |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |