VA SB1790 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
City of Virginia Beach; sports or entertainment project. Grants the City of Virginia Beach certain powers relating to construction of a sports or entertainment project and any related facilities. Among those powers is the authority to (i) issue bonds to construct a sports or entertainment project, (ii) receive state sales and use tax revenue that is attributable to such project, and (iii) use such revenue to repay such bonds. The bill provides that the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to state sales and use tax revenue shall expire on July 1, 2039. The powers granted by the bill to the City of Virginia Beach are similar to those granted to the Hampton Roads Sports Facility Authority.
Title
Sports or entertainment project; City of Va. Beach granted certain powers relating to construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793) | |
2019-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1790ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 27-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed House (71-Y 27-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported from Finance (17-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19107333D |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Unanimous consent to introduce |