VA SB203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Redistricting; Virginia Redistricting Commission; standards and criteria. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Commission (the Commission) pursuant to Article II, Sections 6 and 6-A of the Constitution of Virginia. The Commission, tasked with establishing districts for the United States House of Representatives and for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly, will consist of eight legislative commissioners and eight citizen commissioners. The legislative commissioners consist of four members of the Senate of Virginia and four members of the House of Delegates, with equal representation given to the political parties having the highest and next highest number of members in their respective houses. The citizen commissioners are chosen by a selection committee consisting of five retired judges of the circuit courts of Virginia, from lists submitted to the selection committee by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, the leader in the House of Delegates of the political party having the next highest number of members in the House of Delegates, the President pro tempore of the Senate of Virginia, and the leader in the Senate of the political party having the next highest number of members in the Senate. The bill contains eligibility requirements for the citizen commissioners, including restrictions on holding or having held partisan national or state public office. As part of the application process for service on the Commission, the Division of Legislative Services acts as a repository for applications submitted by interested persons and is tasked with screening out applicants who are ineligible or submit incomplete applications. The applications of the citizen candidates selected by political leadership and submitted for consideration to the selection committee are public records.
Title
Redistricting; Virginia Redistricting Commission established.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-03-08 | House | House acceded to request for second conference committee |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested second conference committee (33-Y 5-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Simon, VanValkenburg, Price |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Barker, Ruff |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (25-Y 15-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment (86-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (16-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB203S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107237D-S1 (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20108171D-S2 ( Vogel and Hanger) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB203S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107237D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107237D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102515D |