VA SB217 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; residency of children in kinship care. Allows a child receiving kinship care from a close relative to enroll in the school division where the kinship care provider resides. The bill also allows local school divisions to require one legal parent and the kinship care provider to sign affidavits detailing the kinship care arrangement as well as a power of attorney authorizing the close relative to make educational decisions regarding the child. This bill will sunset on June 30, 2015.
Title
Public schools; residency of children in kinship care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (12-Y 27-N) (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 31-N) (Y: 8 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 17-N) (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (16-Y 81-N) (Y: 16 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 31-N) (Y: 8 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 17-N) (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (16-Y 81-N) (Y: 16 N: 83 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (12-Y 27-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 31-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB217ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12106180D-S3 | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 17-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (76-Y 17-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Delegates: LeMunyon, Yancey, Tyler | |
2012-03-10 | House: Second conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-10 | House: House acceded to request for second conference committee | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Senators: Barker, Newman, Martin | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Second conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (16-Y 81-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report rejected by House (16-Y 81-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12106042D-S2 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: LeMunyon, Yancey, Tyler | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Barker, Martin, Newman | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-08 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (83-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB217H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105694D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Substitute by Delegate Peace 12105915D-H2 rejected | |
2012-03-05 | House: Floor substitute printed 12105915D-H2 (Peace) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105694D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB217S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to12104893D-S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104893D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102654D |