VA SB239 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; violence prevention committee policies and procedures. Requires the violence prevention committee of each public institution of higher education to establish policies and procedures that outline circumstances under which all faculty and staff are to report threatening or aberrant behavior that may represent a physical threat to the community. The bill also requires each violence prevention committee to include notification of family members or guardians, or both, as a sufficient means of action in the committee's policies and procedures for the assessment of individuals whose behavior may present a physical threat, unless such notification would prove harmful to the individual in question.
Title
Student mental health policies and procedures; violence prevention committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 799 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB239ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB239ER) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 14105146D-H1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB239H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105146D-H1 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105146D-H1 |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101218D-E |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB239E |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101218D |