VA SB248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Indigent defendants; right to ex parte hearing for appointment of experts in capital cases. Provides that an indigent defendant who has been charged with a capital offense may move in circuit court for the appointment of experts to assist in the preparation of his defense. The presiding judge shall designate another judge in the judicial circuit who may hold an ex parte hearing on such a motion and may order the appointment of an expert. Prior to an ex parte proceeding, communication, or request, a particularized need for confidentiality must be demonstrated in an adversarial proceeding. A motion for an ex parte hearing shall be in writing and filed under seal and any ex parte hearing conducted shall be on the record and kept under seal as part of the record of the case. The court may unseal the record after the trial is concluded for good cause shown.
Title
Indigent defendants; right to ex parte hearing for appointment of experts in capital cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (74-Y 17-N) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 789 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB248ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (74-Y 17-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (74-Y 17-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB248ER) | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (78-Y 18-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Passed House (78-Y 18-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-10 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 6-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102474D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 264.3:1. | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |