VA SB261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Quality; staffing requirements. Provides that a local school board that is required to employ two full-time librarians for any middle school or high school may meet such requirement by employing two full-time librarians or one full-time librarian and one full-time media specialist or instructional resource teacher. The bill also provides that a local school board that is required to employ a full-time school-based clerical person for the library for any middle school or high school may meet such requirement by employing one full-time school-based clerical person for the library, for instruction, or for assessment or career planning, or by employing one full-time classroom instructional assistant.
Title
Standards of Quality; staffing requirements, librarians and clerical personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 12-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-02 | House | Referred from Appropriations by voice vote |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Education |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18101780D-E |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB261E |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Suetterlein agreed to |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101780D |