VA SB265 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hospice and home health care; licensure. Amends hospice licensure standards to allow inspections of facilities that are exempt from licensure to the extent necessary to ensure public health and safety, and allows the Commissioner of Health to cause any hospice or home care organization facility that fails such inspection to be relicensed. The bill requires home care organizations approved for payments for home health or personal care services by the Department of Medical Assistance Services prior to July 1, 2010, and not exempt from licensure to apply for licensure within 180 days of the effective date of the act and provides that such organizations shall be exempt from licensure until July 1, 2012, or until such time as the Commissioner has acted upon their application for licensure, whichever occurs first. This bill also prohibits new home care organizations from being licensed until July 1, 2012, but allows the Commissioner of Health to issue a request for and accept applications for: (i) the establishment of home care organizations in federally designated Health Professional Shortage Areas or (ii) home care organizations approved for payments for home health or personal care services by the Department of Medical Assistance Services prior to July 1, 2010.
Title
Hospice, home health care or personal care services; licensure for home care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB265ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB265ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB265S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105035D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105035D-S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100862D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 162.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |