VA SB282 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fire Services Board; meetings. Allows the Virginia Fire Services Board to meet two additional times per calendar year for a total of six meetings. Under current law, the Board is limited to meeting no more than four times per calendar year.
Title
Virginia Fire Services Board; Board shall meet no more than six times per year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (8-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB282ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102147D-E |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB282E |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102147D |
Same As/Similar To
HB561 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)