VA SB30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Provides for all appropriations of the Budget submitted by the Governor of Virginia in accordance with the provisions of § 2.2-1509, Code of Virginia, and provides a portion of revenues for the two years ending respectively on the thirtieth day of June 2021, and the thirtieth day of June 2022.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake rejected (Item 145#16s) (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Stanley rejected (P.013 Item 68#3s) (15-Y 24-N) (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.159 Item 326#1) (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake rejected (Item 145#16s) (16-Y 24-N) (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Stanley rejected (P.013 Item 68#3s) (15-Y 24-N) (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.159 Item 326#1) (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment rejected |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Cosgrove withdrawn |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Reeves withdrawn |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake rejected (Item 145#16s) (16-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Budget floor amendments agreed to available |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to (Item 139#1s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Reeves rejected (Item 128#3s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator DeSteph rejected (Item 128#2s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stanley rejected (P.013 Item 68#3s) (15-Y 24-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.159 Item 326#1) (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | (P.159 Item 322#5) (P.167 Item 350#3) (P.242 Item C-68#1) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.137 Item 313#38s) (P.142 Item 317#4s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | (P.050 Item 145#9s) (P.092 Item 275#1s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | (P.023 Item 111#1s) (P.024 Item 113#3s) (P.029 Item 120#1s) (P.032 Item 130#2s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | (P.007 Item 39#2s) (P.013 Item 61#1s) (P.019 Item 99#2s) (P.020 Item 105#1s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Contested committee amendments agreed to (P.002 Item 1#1s) (P.002 Item 1#2s) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Member Budget amendments available |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104380D |