VA SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; remote patient monitoring; rural and underserved populations. Amends the State Plan for Medical Assistance Services to require the payment of medical assistance for medically necessary and clinically effective remote patient monitoring services for rural and underserved populations, with the home as an eligible telemedicine originating site. The bill requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to prepare and submit to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services an application for such waiver or waivers as may be necessary to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill also requires the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the status of such application or applications by October 1, 2020. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
DMAS; remote patient monitoring, rural populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20100392D-E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB300E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100392D |