VA SB310 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public animal shelters; notice to euthanize. Requires each public animal shelter to adopt a policy under which it waits a certain number of days before euthanizing a dog or cat when a person has notified the shelter of his intent to adopt or take custody of the animal. The shelter must make reasonable efforts to accomplish the release of the animal but is not required hold the animal if it has reason to believe that the animal has seriously injured a human or the animal meets certain other specified conditions for euthanasia. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public animal shelters; notice to euthanize.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20107287D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB310ES1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107287D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-04SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107287D-S1
2020-01-21SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101026D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326546(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB310
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB310+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB310S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB310ES1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0073+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0211+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0310+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0310+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0310+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0310+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0310+SB0310
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0101V0037+SB0310

Bill Comments

feedback