VA SB314 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872)
Summary
Veterans Services Foundation. Establishes the Veterans Services Foundation as a body politic and corporate for the purposes of carrying out its statutory powers and duties. The bill also (i) adds the Chair of the Joint Leadership Council and eight citizen members appointed by the Speaker of the House and the Senate Committee on Rules to the board of trustees and (ii) clarifies the purpose of the foundation to raise funds from the private sector for veterans services and programs in the state. This bill is identical to
Title
Veterans Services Foundation; established to provide funding for veteran services and programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0872) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 872 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB314ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB314ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB314H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081878744-H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 081878744-H1 | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082360228 |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Same As) 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0486)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB314 |