VA SB316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1253)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; date of June primary election. Changes the date of the primary election held in June from the second Tuesday in June to the third Tuesday in June. The bill also changes candidate filing deadlines to reflect the change of date. The provisions of the bill do not become effective unless reenacted by the 2021 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Elections; date of June primary election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (63-Y 30-N) (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 24-N) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 24-N) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1253) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1253 (effective - see bill) |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB316ER2) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (63-Y 30-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (63-Y 30-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB316ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 24-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House (72-Y 24-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103661D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 515.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |