VA SB317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Inpatient psychiatric services; in-home follow-up nursing services upon discharge. Directs the State Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to promulgate regulations that require each provider of inpatient psychiatric services to develop and implement a policy for linking individuals who will be discharged from inpatient psychiatric care with in-home follow-up nursing services as available, including assistance with medication management, upon discharge, which may be provided by a licensed home care organization, certified home health agency, community services board, or other appropriate service provider, allowing patient choice to the greatest extent possible in the selection of such service provider.
Title
Licensed inpatient nursing services; in-home follow-up care upon discharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB317S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106057D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106057D-S1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103658D |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote