VA SB33 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer finance companies. Requires the State Corporation Commission, as a condition of licensing a consumer finance company, to find that the applicant will not make consumer finance loans at the same location at which the applicant makes payday loans or motor vehicle title loans. The measure also (i) sets the minimum and maximum amounts of a consumer finance loan at $500 and $35,000, respectively; (ii) requires that such loans be installment loans with a term that is not less than six months nor more than 120 months; (iii) sets the maximum annual interest rate on such loans at 36 percent; (iv) authorizes late payment fees of $20, provided that they are set forth in a contract; (v) authorizes loan processing fees of the greater of $75 or five percent of the principal amount of the loan but not to exceed $150; and (vi) increases from $15 to $25 the amount of a bad check fee.
Title
Consumer finance companies; loans, licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommitted to Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20104525D-S1 |
2020-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101103D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |