VA SB344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Senate Committee on Finance; Senate Committee for Courts of Justice; name change. Updates the Code of Virginia by providing that any reference to the "Senate Finance Committee" or the "Senate Committee on Finance" means the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations and any reference to the "Senate Courts of Justice Committee" or the "Senate Committee for Courts of Justice" means the Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
Title
Senate Committee on Finance; name changed to Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB344S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108014D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108014D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102883D |