VA SB352 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds lymphoma, non-Hodgkin lymphoma, and cancers of the colon, brain, and testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters and certain employees develop them. The measure also reduces, from 12 years to five years, the minimum number of years of continuous service that such firefighters and other employees are required to have completed in order to qualify for the presumption that such a condition is an occupational disease suffered in the line of duty.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103123D |