VA SB363 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway. Designates the portion of U.S. Route 221 between the Town of Bedford and the City of Lynchburg the "Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway." The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to HB 1007.
Title
Delegate Lacey E. Putney Memorial Highway; designating certain portion of U.S. Route 221.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 235 (effective 3/9/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB363ER) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18102108D |