VA SB364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle liability insurance coverage limits. Increases the minimum liability coverage amount from $20,000 to $50,000 for injury to or destruction of property of others in any one accident. The bill applies to motor vehicle insurance policies issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2019. This bill incorporates SB 611.
Title
Motor vehicle liability insurance; increases minimum liability coverage amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB364S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106508D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Incorporates SB611 (Surovell) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106508D-S1 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102045D |