VA SB375 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pickup or panel truck; definitions. Amends the definitions of "pickup or panel truck" and "truck" for purposes of Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles) so that pickup or panel trucks registered for personal use and with a gross weight in excess of 7,500 pounds but not in excess of 10,000 pounds are not registered as trucks.
Title
Pickup or panel truck and trucks; amends definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB375ER2) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB375ER) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-25 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103647D |