VA SB376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency vehicles of the Virginia National Guard. Provides that, for the purposes of exemptions granted to emergency vehicles in certain situations, the term "emergency vehicle" shall include any Virginia National Guard Civil Support Team vehicle when responding to an emergency. The bill additionally permits such vehicles to be equipped with flashing, blinking, or alternating red or red and white combination warning lights.
Title
Emergency vehicles; Virginia National Guard vehicles exempt from certain situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 800 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB376ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB376ER) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to |
2014-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB376S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104001D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104001D-S1 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103215D |