VA SB39 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Same-sex marriages; civil unions. Repeals the statutory prohibitions on same-sex marriages and civil unions or other arrangements between persons of the same sex purporting to bestow the privileges and obligations of marriage. These prohibitions are no longer valid due to the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. ___ (June 26, 2015).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Same-sex marriages; civil unions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateIncorporated by Judiciary
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101093D

Same As/Similar To

SB17 (Similar To) 2020-02-19 - VOTE: Passage (62-Y 38-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback