VA SB403 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; Division of Engineering and Buildings; custody, control, and supervision of the Virginia War Memorial Carillon. Places full custody, control, and supervision of the Virginia War Memorial Carillon in the Division of Engineering and Buildings by repealing provisions of the Code that give the City of Richmond responsibility for the upkeep of the Carillon and authority over its use.
Title
Va. War Memorial Carillon; control, etc., by Div. of Engineering & Buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0734) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 734 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB403ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102716D |