VA SB404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee substitute printed 20108547D-H1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; short-term limited-duration medical plans. Prohibits carriers from issuing in the Commonwealth, on or after July 1, 2021, any short-term limited-duration medical plan with a duration that exceeds three months or that can be renewed or extended beyond six months, or if the plan's issuance would result in a covered person being covered by a short-term limited-duration medical plan for more than six months in any 12-month period. The measure prohibits a carrier from issuing a short-term limited-duration medical plan during an annual open enrollment period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; short-term limited-duration medical plans, renewals and extensions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108547D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateChair votes Yes
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
2020-02-05SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102773D-E
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB404E
2020-02-04SenateAmendments by Senator Barker agreed to
2020-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-31SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-30SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102773D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823407.21(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback