VA SB423 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1094)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; mandated coverage for hearing aids for minors. Requires health insurers, health maintenance organizations, and corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts to provide coverage for hearing aids and related services for children 18 years of age or younger when an otolaryngologist recommends such hearing aids and related services. The coverage includes one hearing aid per hearing-impaired ear, up to a cost of $1,500, every 24 months. The measure applies to policies, contracts, and plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; mandated coverage for hearing aids for minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1094)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1094 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB423ER)
2020-03-18SenateEnrolled
2020-03-08HouseVOTE: Adoption (91-Y 2-N)
2020-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (91-Y 2-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: Cole, J.G., Carroll Foy, Fariss
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05SenateSenators: DeSteph, Spruill, Deeds
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-03-05HouseHouse insisted on amendments
2020-03-05SenateHouse amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (97-Y 2-N)
2020-03-05HousePassed House with amendments (97-Y 2-N)
2020-03-05HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05HousePassed House with amendments (95-Y 1-N)
2020-03-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-03-05HouseRead third time
2020-03-04HousePassed by for the day
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102201D-E
2020-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB423E
2020-01-30SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-30SenateRead second time
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102201D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.18(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB423&201+sum+SB423
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB423+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB423E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB423ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1094+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0022+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0063+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0232SB0423+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0249SB0423+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1402V0043+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0299+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0412+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0452+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0492+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2014+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2012+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1633SB0423+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1678SB0423+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1828SB0423+SB0423
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2108+SB0423

Bill Comments

feedback