VA SB429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Withholding of income for child support; independent contractors. Clarifies that income earned by an independent contractor may be withheld by court order for payment of child support obligations.
Title
Child support; withholding from income of an independent contractor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB429ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (62-Y 36-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20100561D-E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB429E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100561D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 278.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1929 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1944 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1946 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |