VA SB454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Blacksburg; public hearings. Clarifies provisions related to public hearings in the Town of Blacksburg by providing that if the town council plans to conduct a public hearing related to a proposed ordinance but to delay action on the proposal, the date for the delayed vote shall be stated on the agenda. Furthermore, the bill allows the council, after conducting and closing the public hearing, to vote to delay action until its next regular meeting.
Title
Blacksburg, Town of; amending charter, public hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB454ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102442D-E |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB454E |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102442D |
Same As/Similar To
HB629 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)