VA SB458 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Microloans for Veterans Program and Fund; creation and administration. Creates the Microloans for Veterans Program and Fund to be administered by the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority (the Authority). The bill directs the Virginia Community College System, working with the Authority and other state agencies, to develop a curriculum to provide education and mentorship to veterans. The Authority is authorized to issue loans of up to $10,000 to veterans who agree to participate in such curriculum and meet other requirements (tier 1 loans). The Authority is authorized to issue loans of up to $50,000 to veterans who have completed the requirements associated with a tier 1 loan and agree to meet advanced education and mentorship requirements (tier 2 loans). The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Microloans for Veterans Program and Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB458S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106335D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106335D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102175D |