VA SB464 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Summary
Virginia Commission on Energy and Environment. Establishes the Virginia Commission on Energy and Environment as a legislative study commission to review and recommend steps to implement the Virginia Energy Plan. The Commission is charged, among other things, to (i) undertake studies and gather information and data, (ii) make recommendations as may be necessary to accomplish its purposes as set forth in the legislation, (iii) make special studies of and reports on measures to secure Virginia's energy future, (iv) establish advisory committees composed of persons with special expertise not represented by individuals serving on the Commission, (v) seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants or donations to enable the Commission to carry out its objectives, (vi) review and make recommendations on legislation affecting energy policy to the General Assembly, and (vii) report annually on its activities during the preceding year to the Governor and the General Assembly. This bill also incorporates
Title
Energy and Climate Change, Commission on; established, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882) | |
2008-05-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 882 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (1-Y 37-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB464ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB464H2 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Substitute by Delegate Jones, S.C agreed to 083988352-H2 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Floor substitute printed 083988352-H2 (C. Jones) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Committee substitute rejected 084255352-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 084255352-H1 | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB464S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087321352-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087321352-S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087060352 |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Energy Conservation and Resources
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Conservation
Energy Conservation and Resources
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB464 |