VA SB480 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; notice of assessment. Requires every notice of assessment to set forth (i) the new and prior two assessed values of land and assessed value of improvements; (ii) the new tax rate and the rates for the prior two tax years; (iii) the total new tax levy and the tax levies for the prior two years; and (iv) the percentage changes in such levies. Under current law, such information is required for the current year and the prior year. The bill also requires the notice to inform each property owner of his right to review and make copies of records maintained by the local assessment office.
Title
Real property tax; notice of assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB480ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB480ER) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendment (94-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-19 | House | Amendment by Delegate Pogge agreed to |
2014-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102581D-E |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB480E |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102581D |