VA SB492 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses requiring registration. Clarifies the registration and reregistration obligations imposed upon a person convicted of a foreign sex offense for the purposes of registration with the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry.
Title
Sex offenses; requiring registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 826 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB492ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 20109405D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB492H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20109405D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109405D-H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104670D |