VA SB497 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage restaurant license; mini bottles. Allows mixed beverage restaurant licensees located on the premises of and operated by a private, nonprofit, or profit club to sell spirits packaged in original closed containers with a maximum capacity of two fluid ounces or 50 milliliters for on-premises consumption.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage restaurant license, mini bottles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB497ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 33-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (66-Y 33-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105125D |