VA SB498 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of resort complex. Expands the definition of "resort complex" to include facilities that (i) are operated by a corporation that operates as a management company which, as its primary function, makes available (a) vacation accommodations, guest rooms, or dwelling units and (b) golf, ski, and other recreational facilities to members of the managed entities and the general public and (ii) have or manage a minimum of 140 private guest rooms or dwelling units contained on not less than 50 acres, whether or not contiguous to the licensed premises. Such facilities will be permitted to obtain a mixed beverage restaurant, on-premises wine and beer, or on-and-off-premises wine and beer license.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; expands definition of resort complex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1010) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1010 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB498ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendment (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB498S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106086D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106086D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104017D |