VA SB499 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Specialty dockets; veterans docket. Provides that any veterans docket authorized and established as a local specialty docket in accordance with the Rules of Supreme Court of Virginia shall be deemed a "Veterans Treatment Court Program," as that term is used under federal law or by any other entity, for the purposes of applying for, qualifying for, or receiving any federal grants, other federal money, or money from any other entity designated to assist or fund such state programs. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Specialty dockets; veterans docket.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 4/2/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB499ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20103355D |