VA SB501 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in General Laws

Summary

Virginia Indoor Clean Air Act; penalty. Moves the regulation of smoking in restaurants from Title 15.2 to a new chapter in Title 32.1. This bill prohibits smoking in all indoor restaurants and bar and lounge areas in the Commonwealth. Requires the posting of “No Smoking” signs and provides for a $25 civil penalty for a violation of these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking; prohibited in restaurants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-03-03 House: Left in General Laws
2008-02-12 House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2008-02-12 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2008-02-12 House: Read first time
2008-02-12 House: Placed on Calendar
2008-02-05 Senate: Communicated to House
2008-02-05 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A)
2008-02-04 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB501S1
2008-02-04 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 084080256-S1
2008-02-04 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2008-02-04 Senate: Read second time
2008-02-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2008-02-01 Senate: Committee substitute printed 084080256-S1
2008-01-31 Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2008-01-18 Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Smoking Legislation
2008-01-09 Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health
2008-01-09 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082377820

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback