VA SB501 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; disqualifying convictions. Provides that a conviction from another state for driving while intoxicated or for drunkenness in public within the preceding three years disqualifies an individual from obtaining a concealed handgun permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permit; DUI from another state disqualifies individual from obtaining.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
2010-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/10)
2010-03-15 Senate: Signed by President
2010-03-14 House: Signed by Speaker
2010-03-13 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB501ER)
2010-03-13 Senate: Enrolled
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to
2010-03-09 House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2010-03-09 House: Read second time
2010-03-08 House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2010-03-05 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2010-02-26 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2010-02-26 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-02-26 House: Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
2010-02-25 House: Subcommittee recommended referring to Courts of Justice by voice vote
2010-02-23 House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1
2010-02-18 House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2010-02-18 House: Read first time
2010-02-18 House: Placed on Calendar
2010-02-16 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2010-02-16 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2010-02-16 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2010-02-15 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2010-01-14 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
2010-01-13 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-01-13 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101822D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+SB501
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB501+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB501ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+CHAP0387+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+S03V0151+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0355SB0501+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0356SB0501+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+SV0357SB0501+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H0801V0171+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+H08V0335+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1418+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1461+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+vot+HV1501+SB0501

Bill Comments

feedback