VA SB501 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Conditions of release on bond; no contact provision. Amends provision that allows a judicial officer to impose as a condition of release on bond for any felony or misdemeanor a provision that the accused may not have contact with a household member for 72 hours by removing the time limitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conditions of release on bond; no contact provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
2014-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/14)
2014-03-09SenateSigned by President
2014-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2014-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB501ER)
2014-03-06SenateEnrolled
2014-03-03HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
2014-03-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2014-03-03HouseRead third time
2014-02-28HouseRead second time
2014-02-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
2014-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2014-02-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2014-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-02-07HouseRead first time
2014-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2014-02-03SenateRead second time and engrossed
2014-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2014-01-29SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2014-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101812D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192123(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback