VA SB501 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; in-state tuition. Prohibits, without the prior statutory approval of the General Assembly, any percent increase in in-state tuition or instructional fees for undergraduate students at Virginia's public institutions of higher education that exceeds twice the annual percent increase, as determined by the State Council for Higher Education, in the Average Consumer Price Index for all items, all urban consumers (CPI-U), as published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the U.S. Department of Labor, from January 1 through December 31 of the year immediately preceding the affected year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; increases in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-09SenatePassed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2016-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance
2016-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2016-01-21SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2016-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100937D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback