VA SB501 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Admissions tax; Wythe County. Authorizes Wythe County to impose an admissions tax at a rate not to exceed 10 percent to any event held on the grounds of any exposition center that (i) has an indoor arena that seats at least 2,000 persons and an outdoor multipurpose space and (ii) is located on all or part of a parcel of land containing at least 40 acres.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Admissions tax; Wythe County authorized to impose tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0365)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 365 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB501ER)
2018-02-28SenateEnrolled
2018-02-26SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2018-02-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
2018-02-22HousePassed House with amendment (76-Y 22-N)
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-02-22HouseAmendment by Delegate Campbell agreed to
2018-02-22HouseRead third time
2018-02-21HouseRead second time
2018-02-19HouseReported from Finance (14-Y 7-N)
2018-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
2018-01-19SenatePrinted as engrossed 18101833D-E
2018-01-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB501E
2018-01-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-01-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-01-19SenateRead second time
2018-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101833D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813818.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB501
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB501+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB501E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB501ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0365+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0009+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0066SB0501+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0084SB0501+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0125+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0977+SB0501
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0687SB0501+SB0501

Bill Comments

feedback