VA SB501 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption and foster care; persons authorized to conduct home studies. Allows home studies for purposes of adoption or foster care placements to be conducted by any person who has completed the home study training program established by regulations of the Board of Social Services. Under current law, such home studies must be conducted by a local board of social services or licensed child-placing agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption and foster care; persons authorized to conduct home studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenatePrinted as engrossed 20103296D-E
2020-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB501E
2020-02-06SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-06SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-17SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103296D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321231(n/a)See Bill Text
632904(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback