VA SB5013 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of marijuana; prepay penalty. Provides that a violation of possession of marijuana by an adult shall be a prepayable offense.
Title
Marijuana; possession, violations by an adult shall be prepayable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003) | |
2020-10-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020 | |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020 |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5013ER) |
2020-10-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 34-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed House (63-Y 34-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5013S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200793D-S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200793D-S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (11-Y 2-N) |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200041D |