VA SB5031 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Legal holidays; Juneteenth. Recognizes the nineteenth day of June of each year, also known as Juneteenth, as a legal holiday in the Commonwealth to commemorate the announcement of the abolition of slavery in Texas, the last of the former Confederate States of America to abolish slavery, and to recognize the significant roles and many contributions of African Americans to the Commonwealth and the nation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal holidays; Juneteenth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
2020-10-13Senatefirst day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)
2020-10-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (Per article IV, Section 13, this bill will be effective on the
2020-10-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020
2020-10-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-02SenateSigned by President
2020-10-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5031ER)
2020-10-02HouseEnrolled
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseFloor Substitute ruled not germane
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-25HouseFloor substitute printed 20201267D-H1 (Davis)
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-21HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-02SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-08-28SenateRead first time
2020-08-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-08-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200726D

Same As/Similar To

HB5052 (Same As) 2020-10-13 - first day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223300(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback